EP0609609 - Method for manufacturing a hydrogen-absorbing alloy for a negative electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/32] | Hydrogen-absorbing alloy for a negative electrode and manufacturing method therefor | ||
[1998/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 55, Hondori 2-Chome, Keihan Moriguchi-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 18, 2 chome, Keihan-Hondori Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tadokoro, Motoo 5-16-302, Nahiriha-cho Ashiya-City, Hyogo 659 / JP | 02 /
Kimoto, Mamoru 2-15-18, Sugiyamate Hirakata-City, Osaka 573 / JP | 03 /
Nishio, Koji 2-5-20, Miyanosaka Hirakata-City, Osaka 573 / JP | 04 /
Saitoh, Toshiniko 5-10-11, Oshumigaoka, Tanabe-Cho Tuzukigun, Kyoto 610-03 / JP | [1994/32] | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 93307911.3 | 05.10.1993 | [1994/32] | Priority number, date | US19930014382 | 05.02.1993 Original published format: US 14382 | [1994/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0609609 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0609609 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0609609 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C22C45/04, H01M4/38 | [1994/32] | CPC: |
H01M4/383 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y10S420/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1994/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Wasserstoffabsorbierenden Legierung für negative Elektrode | [1998/10] | English: | Method for manufacturing a hydrogen-absorbing alloy for a negative electrode | [1998/10] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un alliage absorbant l'hydrogène pour électrode négative | [1998/10] |
Former [1994/32] | Wasserstoffabsorbierende Legierung für negative Elektrode und Verfahren zur Herstellung | ||
Former [1994/32] | Hydrogen-absorbing alloy for a negative electrode and manufacturing method therefor | ||
Former [1994/32] | Alliage absorbant l'hydrogène pour électrode négative et méthode de fabrication | Examination procedure | 31.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/52] | 07.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]JPH03280357 ; | [Y]JPH02228434 ; | [A]JPH0393158 ; | [A]JPH0393159 ; | [DA]JPH03219036 ; | [A]EP0417802 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]US5135589 (FETCENKO MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 5 * claim 1 * | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920312), vol. 16, no. 101, Database accession no. (E - 1177), & JP03280357 A 19911211 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [DY] 1-12 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, (1990), Database accession no. 318006, & JPH02228434 A 19900911 (SANYO ELECTRIC K.K.) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910711), vol. 15, no. 273, Database accession no. (E - 1088), & JP03093158 A 19910418 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910711), vol. 15, no. 273, Database accession no. (E - 1088), & JP03093159 A 19910418 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911218), vol. 15, no. 500, Database accession no. (C - 0895), & JP03219036 A 19910926 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [DA] * abstract * |