EP0592197 - Image-transferring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.1998 [1998/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1994/15] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayamizu, Tadashi 2-2-21, Hikarigaoka-machi, Hataka-ku Fukuoka / JP | [1994/15] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 93307918.8 | 06.10.1993 | [1994/15] | Priority number, date | JP19920267073 | 06.10.1992 Original published format: JP 26707392 | [1994/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0592197 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0592197 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0592197 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/16, G03G15/01 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
G03G15/1605 (EP,US);
G03G15/168 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/15] | G03G15/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/15] | Title | German: | Bildübertragungsvorrichtung | [1994/15] | English: | Image-transferring device | [1994/15] | French: | Dispositif de transfert d'images | [1994/15] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1993 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 20.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPH04191776 ; | [YA]JPH04194886 ; | [YA]JPS5987481 ; | [YA]JPH02163777 ; | [YA]EP0420557 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [Y] 1-4,8 * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 56; figure - * [A] 9; | [A]JPH04263279 ; | [A]JPS58105268 ; | [A]JPH0481785 ; | [A]US5027159 (ODA MASATAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * column W * | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921023), vol. 016, no. 516, Database accession no. (P - 1443), & JP04191776 A 19920710 (KONICA CORP) [X] 1,12 * abstract * [A] 9 [Y] 2,3,8 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921027), vol. 016, no. 522, Database accession no. (P - 1445), & JP04194886 A 19920714 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 2,3,8 * abstract * [A] 1,4,9,12 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840914), vol. 008, no. 202, Database accession no. (P - 300), & JP59087481 A 19840521 (KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO KK) [Y] 2,3,8 * abstract * [A] 1,4 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900912), vol. 014, no. 422, Database accession no. (P - 1104), & JP02163777 A 19900625 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-4,8 * abstract * [A] 9,12 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930129), vol. 017, no. 049, Database accession no. (P - 1478), & JP04263279 A 19920918 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-4,8,9,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830916), vol. 007, no. 210, Database accession no. (P - 223), & JP58105268 A 19830623 (FUJI XEROX KK) [A] 5-12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920703), vol. 016, no. 301, Database accession no. (P - 1379), & JP04081785 A 19920316 (MINOLTA CAMERA CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |