EP0587457 - Thermally resistant cyanoacrylates employing substituted naphthosultone additive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): MC | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LOCTITE CORPORATION Hartford Square North, 10 Columbus Boulevard Hartford Connecticut 06106 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states LOCTITE CORPORATION Hartford Square North, 10 Columbus Boulevard Hartford, Connecticut 06106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Attarwala, Shabbir 191 Mohegan Drive West Hartford, CT 06117 / US | [1994/11] | Representative(s) | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 93307934.5 | 06.10.1993 | [1994/11] | Priority number, date | US19920960480 | 08.10.1992 Original published format: US 960480 | [1994/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0587457 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0587457 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C09J4/00 | [1994/11] | CPC: |
C09J4/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09J11/06 (KR);
C08K5/46 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C09J4/00, C08F222/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/11] | Title | German: | Hitzebestaendige Cyanoacrylate, die ein substituiertes Naphthosulton als Additiv enthalten | [1994/11] | English: | Thermally resistant cyanoacrylates employing substituted naphthosultone additive | [1994/11] | French: | Cyanoacrylates résistant à la chaleur utilisant comme additif une naphthosultone substituée | [1994/11] | Examination procedure | 25.10.1993 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/16] | 17.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.05.1994 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 19.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 03.05.1995 | DK | 03.05.1995 | GR | 03.05.1995 | LI | 03.05.1995 | MC | 03.05.1995 | PT | 03.08.1995 | IE | 31.10.1995 | LU | 31.10.1995 | [2003/18] |
Former [2003/17] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
DK | 03.05.1995 | ||
GR | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
PT | 03.08.1995 | ||
MC | 06.10.1995 | ||
IE | 31.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [2001/24] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
DK | 03.05.1995 | ||
GR | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
MC | 03.05.1995 | ||
PT | 03.08.1995 | ||
IE | 31.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
DK | 03.05.1995 | ||
GR | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
PT | 03.08.1995 | ||
IE | 31.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [1998/38] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
DK | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
PT | 03.08.1995 | ||
IE | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
DK | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
PT | 03.08.1995 | ||
Former [1998/14] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
PT | 03.08.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
LI | 03.05.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE2018042 (INTERCONTINENTAL CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED) [DA] 1; | [DA]FR2121825 (INTERCONTINENTAL CHEM CO LTD [IE]) [DA] 1; | US3742018 [ ] (O SULLIVAN D); | US3832334 [ ] (O SULLIVAN D, et al); | [A]GB1422439 (LOCTITE IRELAND LTD)[A] 1 |