EP0593246 - Conveyor with three plane locking system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weskamp, Robert 720 Dartmouth Drive Buffalo Grove Illinois 60089 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | For all designated states Weskamp, Robert 720 Dartmouth Drive Buffalo Grove, Illinois 60089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/16] | Representative(s) | Heath, Derek James, et al BROMHEAD & CO. 19 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6EF / GB | [1994/16] | Application number, filing date | 93308096.2 | 12.10.1993 | [1994/16] | Priority number, date | US19920959888 | 13.10.1992 Original published format: US 959888 | [1994/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0593246 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0593246 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65G49/00, B65G37/02, B65G47/88, B23Q7/16 | [1994/16] | CPC: |
B23P21/004 (EP);
B23Q1/28 (EP);
B23Q7/14 (EP);
B23Q7/1426 (EP);
B65G17/002 (EP);
B65G47/8815 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1994/16] | Title | German: | Förderer mit einem drei-Ebenen Blockiersystem | [1994/16] | English: | Conveyor with three plane locking system | [1994/16] | French: | Convoyeur avec un système de blocage à trois plans | [1994/16] | Examination procedure | 08.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 24.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 04.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 13.08.1997 | FR | 13.08.1997 | IT | 13.08.1997 | LI | 13.08.1997 | GB | 13.11.1997 | SE | 13.11.1997 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/35] | CH | 13.08.1997 | |
FR | 13.08.1997 | ||
IT | 13.08.1997 | ||
LI | 13.08.1997 | ||
GB | 13.11.1997 | ||
SE | 13.11.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | CH | 13.08.1997 | |
IT | 13.08.1997 | ||
LI | 13.08.1997 | ||
GB | 13.11.1997 | ||
SE | 13.11.1997 | ||
FR | 09.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/41] | CH | 13.08.1997 | |
LI | 13.08.1997 | ||
GB | 13.11.1997 | ||
SE | 13.11.1997 | ||
FR | 09.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | CH | 13.08.1997 | |
LI | 13.08.1997 | ||
SE | 13.11.1997 | ||
FR | 09.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/15] | CH | 13.08.1997 | |
LI | 13.08.1997 | ||
SE | 13.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | CH | 13.08.1997 | |
LI | 13.08.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4010697 ; | [X]GB2154351 ; | [A]US4674620 |