EP0601699 - Method of storing data in a disk array [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2000 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | For all designated states HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS AMERICA 510 Cottonwood Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | For all designated states Symbios, Inc. 2001 Danfield Court Fort Collins Colorado 80525 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
For all designated states HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS AMERICA 510 Cottonwood Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | |||
For all designated states Symbios, Inc. 2001 Danfield Court Fort Collins, Colorado 80525 / US | |||
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
For all designated states HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS AMERICA 510 Cottonwood Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | |||
For all designated states SYMBIOS LOGIC INC. 2001 Danfield Court Fort Collins, Colorado 80525 / US | |||
Former [1996/20] | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
For all designated states HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS AMERICA 510 Cottonwood Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | |||
For all designated states SYMBIOS LOGIC INC. 2001 Danfield Court Fort Collins, Colorado 80525 / US | |||
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
For all designated states HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS AMERICA 510 Cottonwood Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | |||
Former [1994/43] | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
Former [1994/24] | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DeMoss, Robert A. 505 N. Tyler No113 Wichita, KS 67212 / US | 02 /
Dulac, Keith B. 8652 Hila Derby, KS 67037 / US | [1994/24] | Representative(s) | Gill, David Alan, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | Gill, David Alan, et al W.P. Thompson & Co., Celcon House, 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | ||
Former [1999/41] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [1996/03] | Gill, David Alan W.P. Thompson & Co., Celcon House, 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | ||
Former [1995/21] | Gill, David Alan W.H. Beck, Greener & Co., 7 Stone Buildings, Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | ||
Former [1994/24] | Robinson, Robert George International Patent Department NCR Limited 915 High Road North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93308453.5 | 22.10.1993 | [1994/24] | Priority number, date | US19920966107 | 23.10.1992 Original published format: US 966107 | [1994/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0601699 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0601699 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | [1998/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00, G06F3/06, G11B20/18 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
G06F11/1076 (EP,US);
G06F11/1008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/24] | G06F11/00, G06F3/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/24] | Title | German: | Datenspeicherungsverfahren in einer Speicherplattenanordnung | [1994/24] | English: | Method of storing data in a disk array | [1994/24] | French: | Méthode de stockage de données dans un réseau de disques | [1994/24] | Examination procedure | 03.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 26.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/34] | 30.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0493984 (ARRAY TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9113405 (SF2 CORP [US]) [A] 7 * column A *; | [E]EP0569313 (IBM [US]) [E] 1-4,6 * the whole document * | [X] - "USING DUAL ACTUATOR SHARED DATA DIRECT ACCESS STORAGE DEVICES DRIVES IN A REDUNDANT ARRAY", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, USA, (199101), vol. 33, no. 8, pages 270 - 272, XP000106955 [X] 1-3,6,7 * the whole document * |