EP0596639 - Mail processing system having a meter activity log [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Stamford Connecticut 06926-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Collins, Jacqueline 200 Woodmont Avenue Apt. 16 Bridgeport, Connecticut 06606 / US | 02 /
Doeberl, Terence M. 111 Simpaug Tpke West Redding, Connecticut 06896 / US | 03 /
Gravell, Linda V. 70 Indian Cove Road Guildford, Connecticut 06437 / US | 04 /
Hunter, Kevin D. 440 Allyndale Drive Startford, Connecticut 06497 / US | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Zangs, Rainer E., et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | Zangs, Rainer E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/19] | Cook, Anthony John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 93308512.8 | 26.10.1993 | [1994/19] | Priority number, date | US19920967305 | 26.10.1992 Original published format: US 967305 | [1994/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0596639 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0596639 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0596639 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/02, G07B17/00 | [1995/19] | CPC: |
G07B17/00362 (EP,US);
G06Q40/12 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00427 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/19] | G07B17/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1994/19] | Title | German: | Postverarbeitungssystem mit Aufzeichnung der Betriebsdaten von Frankiermaschinen | [1998/36] | English: | Mail processing system having a meter activity log | [1994/19] | French: | Système de traitement de courrier avec enregistrement des activités de machines à affranchir | [1998/36] |
Former [1994/19] | Postverarbeitungssystem mit Aufzeichnung der Frankiermaschinenbetätigungen | ||
Former [1994/19] | Système de traitement de courrier avec enregistrement des activités de la machine d'affranchissement | Examination procedure | 20.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 06.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.1999
18.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE NEOPOST LTD South Street Romford, Essex, RM1 2AR / GB Opponent's representative Kreutzer, Ulrich, et al, et al CBDL Patentanwälte Königstrasse 57 47051 Duisburg / DE | 02
02.06.1999
03.12.2001
WITHDRAWN Société SECAP 21, rue Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR Opponent's representative Santarelli, Luc Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.1999
18.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE NEOPOST LTD South Street Romford, Essex, RM1 2AR / GB Opponent's representative Kreutzer, Ulrich, et al, et al CBDL Patentanwälte Königstrasse 57 47051 Duisburg / DE | ||
02
02.06.1999
03.12.2001
WITHDRAWN Société SECAP 21, rue Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR Opponent's representative Santarelli, Luc Santarelli 14 avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2008/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.1999
18.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE NEOPOST LTD South Street Romford, Essex, RM1 2AR / GB Opponent's representative Spott, Gottfried, et al, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | ||
02
02.06.1999
03.12.2001
WITHDRAWN Société SECAP 21, rue Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR Opponent's representative Santarelli, Luc Santarelli 14 avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1999/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.1999
NEOPOST LTD South Street Romford, Essex, RM1 2AR / GB Opponent's representative Weinmiller, Jürgen Lennéstrasse 9 82340 Feldafing / DE | ||
02
02.06.1999
Société SECAP 21, rue Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR Opponent's representative Santarelli, Luc Cabinet Rinuy Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1999/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.1999
NEOPOST LTD South Street Romford, Essex, RM1 2AR / GB Opponent's representative Weinmiller, Jürgen Lennéstrasse 9 82340 Feldafing / DE | 23.08.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.09.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.04.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 23.07.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/46] | Appeal following opposition | 07.06.2006 | Appeal received No. T0893/06 | 31.07.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.07.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 23.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.07.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 26.10.2008 | CH | 31.10.2008 | FR | 31.10.2008 | LI | 31.10.2008 | DE | 01.05.2009 | [2010/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8801818 (WRIGHT CHRISTOPHER B [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 7; claim 1 *; | [A]CA1248233 (SIMARD JEAN LOUIS) [A] 1-15* figures 1,2; claims 1,6 *; | [A]GB2251210 (ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS [GB]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 10 - line 28; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0493943 (ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS [GB]) [X] 1,9 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 26; figure 1 * |