Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] |
21.02.1997 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.04.1997 [1997/15] |
25.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
08.11.1996 | Renewal fee | |
03.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
22.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant | |
22.03.1996 | First examination report | |
03.11.1994 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.12.1994 [1994/51] |
17.03.1994 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] |