EP0595631 - Diamond bearing assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSIR Corporate Building, Scientia Pretoria 0001 / ZA | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | For all designated states CSIR Scientia, Meiring Naude Street Pretoria Transvaal / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Damm, Oliver Frank Rudolf August 633 Turf Street, Wingate Park Pretoria, Transvaal / ZA | 02 /
Tank, Klaus 9 Warbleton Avenue, Essexwold Johannesburg, Transvaal / ZA | [1994/18] | Representative(s) | Leale, Robin George Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | Leale, Robin George FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93308592.0 | 28.10.1993 | [1994/18] | Priority number, date | ZA19920008328 | 28.10.1992 Original published format: ZA 928328 | ZA19920008329 | 28.10.1992 Original published format: ZA 928329 | ZA19920008330 | 28.10.1992 Original published format: ZA 928330 | [1994/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0595631 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0595631 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E21B4/00, F16C17/04 | [1994/18] | CPC: |
E21B4/003 (EP,US);
F16C17/04 (EP,US);
F16C17/26 (EP,US);
F16C33/043 (EP,US);
F16C33/26 (EP,US);
F16C2206/04 (EP,US);
F16C2352/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, SE [1994/18] | Title | German: | Aus Diamant bestehender Lagerzusammenbau | [1994/18] | English: | Diamond bearing assembly | [1994/18] | French: | Assemblage de palier consistant en diamant | [1994/18] | Examination procedure | 25.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/51] | 26.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4560014 (GECZY BELA A [US]); | [A]US4620601 (NAGEL DAVE D [US]); | [A]US4410054 (NAGEL DAVE D [US], et al); | [A]DE2916347 (CHRISTENSEN INC); | [A]US5092687 (HALL DAVID R [US]); | [A]EP0198112 (CHRISTENSEN INC NORTON [US]); | [A]US4468138 (NAGEL DAVE D [US]) |