EP0595637 - Digital mobile radio communication system with repeat request of a burst of speech or data following error recognition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2000 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [1997/39] |
Former [1994/18] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. P.O. Box 86 SF-24101 Salo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malkamäki, Esa Louhentie 20 C 19 SF-02130 Espoo / FI | 02 /
Ranta, Pekka Servin-Maijantie 10 B 18 SF-02150 Espoo / FI | [1994/18] | Representative(s) | Johansson, Folke Anders Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Rights P.O. Box 226 00045 Nokia Group / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Johansson, Folke Anders Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Rights P.O. Box 226 00045 Nokia Group / FI | ||
Former [1997/39] | Johansson, Folke Anders Nokia Mobile Phones Ltd., Patent Department, P.O. Box 100 00045 Nokia Group / FI | ||
Former [1994/18] | Frain, Timothy John Patent Department Nokia Mobile Phones St Georges Court St Georges Road Camberley, Surrey GU15 3QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93308630.8 | 28.10.1993 | [1994/18] | Priority number, date | FI19920004943 | 30.10.1992 Original published format: FI 924943 | [1994/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0595637 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0595637 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18 | [1994/18] | CPC: |
H04L1/1887 (EP,US);
H04L1/0061 (EP,US);
H04L1/0071 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (EP,US);
H04L1/0065 (EP,US);
H04L1/007 (EP,US);
H04L1/1664 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1994/18] | Title | German: | Mobile digitale Funkübertragungsanordnung mit Wiederholungsaufforderung eines Sprach- oder Datenblockes nach Fehlererkennung | [1994/18] | English: | Digital mobile radio communication system with repeat request of a burst of speech or data following error recognition | [1994/18] | French: | Système de radiocommunication mobile numérique avec demande de répétition d'un bloc de parole ou de données sur détection d'erreur | [1994/18] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/01] | 20.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA] - IEEE International Conference on Communications ICC '83, 19.-22.06.1983, Boston, US, vol. 1, pages 323-327, IEEE, New York, US; [Y] 1-4,7-10 * B. DORSCH: 'Successive Check Digits rather than Information Repetition.' * * page 323, column R, line 8 - line 53; figures 3,4 * [A] 5,6 | [YA] - S. LIN / D.J. COSTELLO / M.J.MILLER:, "Automatic Repeat Request Error Control Schemes.", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, PISCATAWAY, NJ US, (198412), vol. 22, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1109/MCOM.1984.1091865, pages 5 - 17, XP000674086 [Y] 1-4,7-10 * page 11, column L, paragraph 2 - page 12, column L, paragraph 2 * [A] 5,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.1984.1091865 | [A] - R STEELE (ED.), Mobile Radio Communications, LONDON,1992, PENTECH PRESS [A] 2,7,8 * page 45, paragraph 3 - page 46, paragraph 1 * | [A] - J. HAGENAUER:, "Rate-Compatible Punctured Convolutional Codes (RCPC Codes) and their Applications.", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK US, (198804), vol. 36, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1109/26.2763, pages 389 - 400, XP000879641 [A] 5,6 * page 389, column R, line 3 - line 18 * * page 396, column R, line 4 - line 11 * * page 398, column L, line 9 - line 13; figures 11,13 * * page 399, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.2763 |