EP0599492 - Coated titanium dioxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TIOXIDE GROUP SERVICES LIMITED Lincoln House, 137-143 Hammersmith Road London W14 0QL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | For all designated states TIOXIDE GROUP SERVICES LIMITED Lincoln House, 137-143 Hammersmith Road London W14 0QL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sayer, Andrew Timothy 7 The Fairway, Eaglescliffe Stockton on Tees, Cleveland TS16 9HL / GB | [1994/22] | Representative(s) | Jackson, John Derek Tioxide Group Limited Patent Department Haverton Hill Road Billingham Cleveland TS23 1PS / GB | [2009/26] |
Former [1994/22] | Jackson, John Derek Tioxide Group Services Limited, Patents Department, Haverton Hill Road Billingham, Cleveland TS23 1PS / GB | Application number, filing date | 93308668.8 | 29.10.1993 | [1994/22] | Priority number, date | GB19920024529 | 24.11.1992 Original published format: GB 9224529 | [1994/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0599492 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0599492 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/36, A61K7/42 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
A61K8/0241 (EP);
A61K8/29 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP);
B82Y30/00 (EP);
C09C1/3661 (EP);
A61K2800/413 (EP);
A61K2800/621 (EP);
C01P2002/02 (EP);
C01P2002/84 (EP);
C01P2004/03 (EP);
C01P2004/10 (EP);
C01P2004/32 (EP);
C01P2004/51 (EP);
C01P2004/52 (EP);
C01P2004/54 (EP);
C01P2004/62 (EP);
C01P2004/64 (EP);
C01P2004/82 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR [1994/22] | Title | German: | Beschichtetes Titandioxid | [1994/22] | English: | Coated titanium dioxide | [1994/22] | French: | Dioxyde de titane revêtu | [1994/22] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 22.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]JPH0517329 ; | [PA]EP0535972 (TIOXIDE SPECIALITIES) [PA] 1,8,11 * claims 1,3 *; | [A]GB2205088 (TIOXIDE GROUP PLC) | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 09, Database accession no. 93-071009, & JPH0517329 A 19930126 (TAYCA CO.) [PX] 1,11,18 * abstract * |