blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0597612

EP0597612 - Output control method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.02.2001 [2001/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/20]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Harada, Takuto, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1994/20]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/20]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date93308680.329.10.1993
[1994/20]
Priority number, dateJP1992029847109.11.1992         Original published format: JP 29847192
[1994/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0597612
Date:18.05.1994
Language:EN
[1994/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0597612
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.1994
ClassificationIPC:G06F3/12
[1994/20]
CPC:
G06F3/1297 (EP,US); C02F1/46109 (EP,US); C02F1/463 (EP,US);
C02F1/4674 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1994/20]
TitleGerman:Ausgabesteuerverfahren und -gerät[1994/20]
English:Output control method and apparatus[1994/20]
French:Méthode et dispositif de contrôle de sortie[1994/20]
Examination procedure30.09.1994Examination requested  [1994/48]
11.11.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.05.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
13.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
05.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.1999Fee for grant paid
09.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
20.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
21.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0192021  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 ** abstract *;
 [Y]EP0250777  (IBM [US]) [Y] 1-4 * figures 1-4,11 * * column 6, line 5 - column 8, line 56 * * column 11, line 1 - line 12 *
 [Y]  - "PARAMETER-SPECIFIC EXERCISING OF HARDWARE DEVICES", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (199101), vol. 33, no. 8, pages 61 - 64 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.