EP0596686 - Stud welding process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.1996 [1996/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMHART INC. Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states EMHART INC. Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kito, Masaru 1-11-8, Minami Ushikawa Toyohashi City / JP | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Wetters, Basil David Peter Emhart Patents Department Emhart International Ltd. 177 Walsall Road Birmingham B42 1BP / GB | [1994/19] | Application number, filing date | 93308722.3 | 01.11.1993 | [1994/19] | Priority number, date | JP19920297368 | 06.11.1992 Original published format: JP 29736892 | [1994/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0596686 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/20 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
B23K9/201 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/19] | Title | German: | Bolzen-Schweissverfahren | [1994/19] | English: | Stud welding process | [1994/19] | French: | Procédé pour le soudage des goujons | [1994/19] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 08.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 01.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/47] | 17.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0167150 (NIPPON SUICHU SAGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-6; claims 1,2 * |