EP0597638 - Radio telecommunication systems and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.1996 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.07.1996 [1996/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VODAFONE LIMITED The Courtyard, 2-4 London Road Newbury Berkshire RG13 1JL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states VODAFONE LIMITED The Courtyard, 2-4 London Road Newbury, Berkshire RG13 1JL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beddoes, Edward William Oak House, Harthill Drove, Redlynch Salisbury, Wiltshire, SP5 2HR / GB | 02 /
McCombe, Michael John 1 Tyne Way, Thatcham Newbury, Berkshire, RG13 3DS / GB | [1994/20] | Representative(s) | Foster, David Martyn, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey Surrey KT16 8LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | Foster, David Martyn, et al MATHISEN MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93308851.0 | 05.11.1993 | [1994/20] | Priority number, date | GB19920023586 | 11.11.1992 Original published format: GB 9223586 | [1994/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0597638 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/04, H04B7/26 | [1994/20] | CPC: |
H04W4/24 (EP);
H04M15/8083 (EP);
H04M15/83 (EP);
H04M2215/0184 (EP);
H04M2215/32 (EP);
H04M2215/82 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GR, IT, SE [1994/20] | Title | German: | Funktelekommunikationssysteme und -verfahren | [1994/20] | English: | Radio telecommunication systems and methods | [1994/20] | French: | Systèmes et méthodes de radio-télécommunications | [1994/20] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 19.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/50] | 05.06.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE3516357 (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,11 * column 2, line 27 - line 65 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 4,5,10,14,15; | [Y]EP0395092 (NEC CORP.) [Y] 4 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 16 * * column 5, line 18 - line 23 * * column 6, line 1 - line 3 * * column 6, line 50 - line 56 *; | [XY]JPH02276396 ; | [A]JPH03135121 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910130), vol. 15, no. 40, Database accession no. (E - 1028), & JP02276396 A 19901113 (NEC CORP.) [X] 12,13,16 * abstract * [Y] 4,5,10,14,15 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910904), vol. 15, no. 348, Database accession no. (E - 1107), & JP03135121 A 19910610 (NEC CORP.) [A] 7 * abstract * |