EP0597692 - Vehicle seat assembly with rotating seat back panel and integral child seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOOVER UNIVERSAL, INC. 49200 Halyard Drive Plymouth Michigan 48170 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states HOOVER UNIVERSAL INC. 49200 Halyard Drive Plymouth, Michigan 48170 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elton, Robert D. 525 North Ashley Ann Arbor, Michigan 48103 / US | [1994/20] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 93308976.5 | 10.11.1993 | [1994/20] | Priority number, date | US19920976451 | 13.11.1992 Original published format: US 976451 | [1994/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0597692 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0597692 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/30, B60N2/36 | [1994/20] | CPC: |
B60N2/3084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/20] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugsitzeinheit mit einer umklappbaren Rückenlehne und einem integrierten Kindersitz | [1994/20] | English: | Vehicle seat assembly with rotating seat back panel and integral child seat | [1994/20] | French: | Ensemble de siège de véhicule comportant un dossier rabattable et un siège d'enfant intégré | [1994/20] | Examination procedure | 11.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/49] | 11.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 09.07.1997 | [2002/26] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0076933 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 14 - page 6, line 5; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US4533176 (WYTTENBACH BILL [US]); | [A]DE3936166 (ZIMMERMANN JOHANN [DE]) [A] 1; | [A]EP0474368 (ROVER GROUP [GB]); | [AP]WO9220549 (DUKATZ MATTHEW E [US], et al) [AP] 1* page 8, line 24 - page 11, line 5; figures 1-25 * |