EP0598561 - Recessed screw [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YUGENKAISHA SHINJO SEISAKUSHO 1-22, Matsu 3-chome Nishinariku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | For all designated states YUGENKAISHA SHINJO SEISAKUSHO 1-22, Matsu 3-chome Nishinariku, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinjo, Katsumi 1-22 Matsu 3-chome Nishinari-ku, Osaka / JP | [1994/21] | Representative(s) | Purvis, William Michael Cameron, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1994/21] | Application number, filing date | 93309033.4 | 11.11.1993 | [1994/21] | Priority number, date | JP19920332544 | 17.11.1992 Original published format: JP 33254492 | [1994/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0598561 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0598561 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16B23/00, B25B15/00 | [1994/21] | CPC: |
B25B15/005 (EP,US);
B25B23/00 (KR);
F16B23/00 (EP,US);
Y10S411/919 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/21] | Title | German: | Schraube mit Ausnehmung | [1994/21] | English: | Recessed screw | [1994/21] | French: | Vis à empreinte | [1994/21] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/49] | 30.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.01.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0524617 (WUERTH ADOLF GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [PX] 1-3 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 5; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]EP0488541 (SHINJO SEISAKUSHO YK [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * column 5, line 2 - line 26; figures 1-3 *; | [DY]US3584667 (REILAND BERNARD F) [DY] 1-3 * column 4, line 17 - line 30; figure 3 *; | JP4839959Y [ ] (...) |