Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5509334 | 23.04.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US14962493 | 09.11.1993 | US39643895 | 28.02.1995 | JP33254492 | 17.11.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0737805B | Global Dossier | 26.04.1995 | B2 | JPH06159339 | 07.06.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | JP33254492 | 17.11.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU668223B | Global Dossier | 26.04.1996 | B2 | AU5045893 | 02.06.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | JP33254492 | 17.11.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0598561 | Global Dossier | 05.03.1997 | B1 | EP0598561 | 25.05.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP33254492 | 17.11.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2108743 | 05.10.1999 | C | CA2108743 | 18.05.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP33254492 | 17.11.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69308484T | 02.10.1997 | T2 | DE69308484D1 | 10.04.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP33254492 | 17.11.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0598561T | 24.03.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP33254492 | 17.11.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2098681T | 01.05.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP33254492 | 17.11.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR960012154B | 16.09.1996 | B1 | KR940011810 | 22.06.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | JP33254492 | 17.11.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5553983 | 10.09.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP33254492 | 17.11.1992 |