EP0598614 - Jack socket assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1999 [1999/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weatherley, Richard 23 Trenter Road Northampton NN3 6AX / GB | [1994/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/21] | Representative(s) | Goodenough, Nigel, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | Goodenough, Nigel, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93309191.0 | 18.11.1993 | [1994/21] | Priority number, date | GB19920024154 | 18.11.1992 Original published format: GB 9224154 | [1994/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0598614 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0598614 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0598614 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/518, H01R23/02, H01R13/74 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
H01R13/518 (EP,US);
H01R13/447 (EP,US);
H01R13/514 (EP,US);
H01R2201/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/21] | H01R13/518 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, IT, NL, SE [1994/21] | Title | German: | Buchsenanordnung | [1994/21] | English: | Jack socket assembly | [1994/21] | French: | Assemblage de prise | [1994/21] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 27.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]US5173061 (COMERCI JOSEPH D [US], et al) [PX] 1 * column 2, line 46 - column 3; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4894024 (DEBORTOLI GEORGE [CA], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 30 - column 7, line 47; figures 1-16 *; | [A]EP0019395 (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 8, paragraph L; figure 8 *; | [A]DE9003879U (TKS TELEFONANLAGENBAU-KOMMUNICATIONSSYSTEME GMBH) [A] 1 * page 1 - page 6; figures 1-4 *; | [A]JPH02276178 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910130), vol. 15, no. 40, Database accession no. (E - 1028), & JP02276178 A 19901113 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS) [A] 1 * abstract * |