EP0600698 - Magnetooptical recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/23] | Magenetooptical recording medium | ||
[1999/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.2000 [2000/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiratori, Tsutomu, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-Chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1994/23] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93309517.6 | 29.11.1993 | [1994/23] | Priority number, date | JP19920320501 | 30.11.1992 Original published format: JP 32050192 | [1994/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0600698 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0600698 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0600698 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G11B11/10 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
G11B11/10582 (EP,US);
G11B11/10506 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/23] | G11B11/10, G11B13/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/23] | Title | German: | Magnetooptischer Aufzeichnungsträger | [1994/23] | English: | Magnetooptical recording medium | [1999/03] | French: | Milieu d'enregistrement magnéto-optique | [1994/23] |
Former [1994/23] | Magenetooptical recording medium | Examination procedure | 12.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 24.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0428321 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP])[A] 1,3,4,5; | [A]EP0451297 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1,3,4,5 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [A] 1,3,4,5 |