Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0602859
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
20.03.1998 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] |
26.02.1998 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
19.12.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.11.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.07.1997 |
First examination report |
|
17.07.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.12.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.01.1996 |
Change - applicant |
published on 07.02.1996 [1996/06] |
08.01.1996 |
Change - representative |
published on 07.02.1996 [1996/06] |
05.01.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.08.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.10.1995 [1995/41] |
30.12.1994 |
Publication of search report |
published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] |
19.12.1994 |
Change - applicant |
published on 08.02.1995 [1995/06] |
06.05.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] |