EP0602859 - Rotatable pin, screw-in pacing and sensing lead having teflon-coated conductor coil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACESETTER, INC. 15900 Valley View Court Sylmar, CA 91392-9221 / US | [1996/06] |
Former [1995/06] | For all designated states Pacesetter AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna / SE | ||
Former [1994/25] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT St Martin Strasse 76 D-81541 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doan, Phong D. 25312 Joyce Place Stevenson Ranch, CA 91381 / US | [1994/25] | Representative(s) | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 93309716.4 | 03.12.1993 | [1994/25] | Priority number, date | US19920985383 | 04.12.1992 Original published format: US 985383 | [1994/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0602859 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0602859 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [1994/25] | CPC: |
A61N1/056 (EP,US);
A61N1/0573 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/25] | Title | German: | Reiz- und Fühlsonde mit drehbarer, schraubenförmiger Befestigung und teflonbeschichteten Leitungswindungen | [1994/25] | English: | Rotatable pin, screw-in pacing and sensing lead having teflon-coated conductor coil | [1994/25] | French: | Sonde de stimulation et de détection à fixation par hélice et à conducteur à enroulements recouvert de téflon | [1994/25] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/41] | 21.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.03.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4649938 (MCARTHUR WILLIAM A [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * column 4, line 54 - column 7, line 28; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US4628943 (MILLER SANDRA L [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 5, line 25 - column 8, line 13; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0149431 (CB BIOELETTRONICA SRL [IT]) [A] 1,2,4 * page 3, line 20 - page 7, line 20; figures 1-4 * |