EP0601817 - Power calculation circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/24] | Power multiplication circuit | ||
[2004/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | ||
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1994/24] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maruyama, Ryoji, c/o Intellectual Property Div. Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1994/24] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [1994/24] | BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 93309774.3 | 06.12.1993 | [1994/24] | Priority number, date | JP19920330844 | 11.12.1992 Original published format: JP 33084492 | [1994/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0601817 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0601817 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01R21/08 | [1994/24] | CPC: |
G01R21/08 (EP,US);
G01R11/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1994/24] | Title | German: | Schaltung zur Leistungsberechnung | [2004/18] | English: | Power calculation circuit | [2004/18] | French: | Circuit de calculation de la puissance | [2004/18] |
Former [1994/24] | Leistungsmultiplikationsschaltung | ||
Former [1994/24] | Power multiplication circuit | ||
Former [1994/24] | Circuit de multiplication de la puissance | Examination procedure | 17.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/24] | 13.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.01.2001 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Request for further processing for: | 21.01.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 26.01.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5834365 ; | [Y]GB2107070 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,2,11 * abstract *; | [A]DE3235188 (KERNFORSCHUNGSANLAGE JUELICH [DE]) [A] 1,11* page 9, line 1 - line 18; figure - *; | [Y]FR2594230 (LANDIS & GYR AG [CH]) [Y] 1,2,11 * page 11, line 29 - page 12, line 34; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3723268 (ISKRA SOZD ELEKTRO INDUS [YU]) [A] 1,11 * abstract *; | [A]GB2199411 (OMEGA ELECTRIC LTD) [A] 1,11 * page 3, paragraph 3; figure 4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830518), vol. 7, no. 113, Database accession no. (P - 197), & JP58034365 A 19830228 (HIOKI DENKI KK.) [X] 1,11 * abstract * |