EP0601835 - Pharmaceutical product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chalmers, Susanna Elizabeth 28 Lobelia Street, Heldervue Somerset West, 7130 Cape Province / ZA | For all designated states Van Der Meer, Michael John 101 Banhoek Road Stellenbosch 7600 / ZA | [N/P] |
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states Chalmers, Susanna Elizabeth 28 Lobelia Street, Heldervue Somerset West, 7130, Cape Province / ZA | ||
For all designated states Van der Meer, Michael John 101 Banhoek Road Stellenbosch 7600 / ZA | |||
Former [1994/24] | For all designated states Chalmers, Susanna Elizabeth 28 Lobelia Street, Heldervue Somerset West, 7130, Cape Province / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chalmers, Susanna Elizabeth 28 Lobelia Street, Heldervue Somerset West 7130, Cape Province / ZA | [2000/36] |
Former [1994/24] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1999/47] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | ||
Former [1994/24] | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 93309828.7 | 07.12.1993 | [1994/24] | Priority number, date | ZA19920009459 | 07.12.1992 Original published format: ZA 929459 | [1994/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0601835 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0601835 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/70, A61K9/18, A61K9/14, A61K47/02, A61K33/14, A61K33/00, A61K31/00 | [1994/24] | CPC: |
A61L15/44 (EP,US);
A61K33/06 (EP,US);
A61K33/14 (EP,US);
A61K33/18 (EP,US);
A61K33/30 (EP,US);
A61L2300/104 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/24] | Title | German: | Pharmazeutisches Produkt | [1994/24] | English: | Pharmaceutical product | [1994/24] | French: | Produit pharmaceutique | [1994/24] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/06] | 12.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 21.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Request for further processing for: | 21.01.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 21.01.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1999 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2000 | BE | 20.09.2000 | CH | 20.09.2000 | ES | 20.09.2000 | FR | 20.09.2000 | GR | 20.09.2000 | IT | 20.09.2000 | LI | 20.09.2000 | NL | 20.09.2000 | LU | 07.12.2000 | DK | 20.12.2000 | PT | 20.12.2000 | SE | 20.12.2000 | DE | 21.12.2000 | MC | 31.12.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 20.09.2000 | |
BE | 20.09.2000 | ||
CH | 20.09.2000 | ||
ES | 20.09.2000 | ||
FR | 20.09.2000 | ||
GR | 20.09.2000 | ||
LI | 20.09.2000 | ||
NL | 20.09.2000 | ||
LU | 07.12.2000 | ||
DK | 20.12.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
DE | 21.12.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 20.09.2000 | |
BE | 20.09.2000 | ||
CH | 20.09.2000 | ||
ES | 20.09.2000 | ||
GR | 20.09.2000 | ||
LI | 20.09.2000 | ||
NL | 20.09.2000 | ||
LU | 07.12.2000 | ||
DK | 20.12.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
DE | 21.12.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
FR | 16.02.2001 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 20.09.2000 | |
BE | 20.09.2000 | ||
CH | 20.09.2000 | ||
ES | 20.09.2000 | ||
GR | 20.09.2000 | ||
LI | 20.09.2000 | ||
NL | 20.09.2000 | ||
DK | 20.12.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
DE | 21.12.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
FR | 16.02.2001 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 20.09.2000 | |
BE | 20.09.2000 | ||
CH | 20.09.2000 | ||
ES | 20.09.2000 | ||
LI | 20.09.2000 | ||
NL | 20.09.2000 | ||
DK | 20.12.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
DE | 21.12.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
FR | 16.02.2001 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 20.09.2000 | |
BE | 20.09.2000 | ||
CH | 20.09.2000 | ||
ES | 20.09.2000 | ||
LI | 20.09.2000 | ||
NL | 20.09.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
DE | 21.12.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
FR | 16.02.2001 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 20.09.2000 | |
BE | 20.09.2000 | ||
CH | 20.09.2000 | ||
ES | 20.09.2000 | ||
LI | 20.09.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
DE | 21.12.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
FR | 16.02.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 20.09.2000 | |
BE | 20.09.2000 | ||
CH | 20.09.2000 | ||
ES | 20.09.2000 | ||
LI | 20.09.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
DE | 21.12.2000 | ||
FR | 16.02.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | AT | 20.09.2000 | |
BE | 20.09.2000 | ||
CH | 20.09.2000 | ||
LI | 20.09.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
DE | 21.12.2000 | ||
FR | 16.02.2001 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 20.09.2000 | |
BE | 20.09.2000 | ||
CH | 20.09.2000 | ||
LI | 20.09.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
FR | 16.02.2001 | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT | 20.09.2000 | |
BE | 20.09.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | BE | 20.09.2000 | |
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/22] | BE | 20.09.2000 | |
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/18] | PT | 20.12.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2331097 (BATTELLE INSTITUT E V)[X] 1,2; | [X]GB1454055 (PHARMACIA AB) [X] 1,6,8,9,11-13; | [X]GB1522770 (SATO M) [X] 1,2,12; | [X]EP0129893 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,12,13; | [A]EP0137743 (GEISTLICH SOEHNE AG [CH]) [A] 1-5,8,12,13; | [A]WO9106289 (WATSON LAB INC [US]) [A] 1,2,6-8,12 |