EP0602924 - Gas chromatographic method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cheh, Christopher Huk-Shi 4239 Anworld Place Mississauga Ontario L4W 2W1 / CA | For all designated states Chang, Shinn-Der 14 Neilson Drive, Unit 905 Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1V6 / CA | For all designated states Weng, Chengwen P.O. Box 515-25 Chengdu Suchuan 610003 / CN | For all designated states Tang, Yuanming P.O. Box 515-25 Chengdu Suchuan 610003 / CN | For all designated states Holzhueter, Ingo Bernd 6 Bimino Crescent North York Ontario M3N 1R9 / CA | For all designated states Hawthorne, Samuel Hugh 3 Farmington Drive Brampton Ontario L6W 2V1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | For all designated states Cheh, Christopher Huk-Shi 4239 Anworld Place Mississauga Ontario L4W 2W1 / CA | ||
For all designated states Chang, Shinn-Der 14 Neilson Drive, Unit 905 Etobicoke, Ontario M9C 1V6 / CA | |||
For all designated states Weng, Chengwen P.O. Box 515-25 Chengdu, Suchuan 610003 / CN | |||
For all designated states Tang, Yuanming P.O. Box 515-25 Chengdu, Suchuan 610003 / CN | |||
For all designated states Holzhueter, Ingo Bernd 6 Bimino Crescent North York, Ontario M3N 1R9 / CA | |||
For all designated states Hawthorne, Samuel Hugh 3 Farmington Drive Brampton Ontario L6W 2V1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/25] | Representative(s) | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1994/25] | Lambert, Hugh Richmond, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 93310043.0 | 13.12.1993 | [1994/25] | Priority number, date | US19920990054 | 14.12.1992 Original published format: US 990054 | [1994/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0602924 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0602924 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/30, G01N30/46, B01D59/00, B01D53/02 | [1995/01] | CPC: |
G01N30/461 (EP,US);
B01D59/26 (EP,US);
G01N30/16 (EP,US);
G01N30/30 (EP,US);
G01N2030/025 (EP,US);
G01N2030/122 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1994/25] | G01N30/30, G01N30/46, B01D59/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/25] | Title | German: | Gasschromatographisches Verfahren und Vorrichtung | [1994/25] | English: | Gas chromatographic method and apparatus | [1994/25] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de chromatographie en phase gazeuse | [1994/25] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/30] | 26.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/09] | 29.09.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2062110 (ANVAR) [X] 1-5,7,9,14-18 * page 1, line 39 - page 2, line 2 * * page 3, lines 19-36; figures 2,3 *; | [X]WO9213622 (PHILLIPS JOHN BRUCE [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,14-18 * page 32, lines 3-16 *; | [XA]US4923486 (RUBEY WAYNE A [US]) [X] 1,14,15,17,18 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 52; figure 9 * * column 11, lines 10-33 * [A] 6,8,19; | [X]US3578757 (SAMUILOV VIKTOR IVANOVICH, et al) [X] 1-3,15,17-19 * column 1, lines 7-13 * * column 1, lines 24-35 * * column 3, lines 23-75; figure 3 *; | [XA]US3043127 (DE FORD DONALD D, et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,14-18 * column 2, lines 42-64; figure 5 * [A] 6; | [X]DE1951377 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,14-19 * page 2, paragraph 2- - page 4, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [X]DE1673027 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-4,14-18 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 1 *; | [X]DE1598449 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,2,5,9,14-18 * page 4, line 9 - page 5, paragraph 2 *; | [A]EP0317054 (CHEH CHRISTOPHER HUK SHI [CA], et al) [A] 8,10 * page 1, lines 13-33 * * page 4, lines 17-49; figures 2,3 * * page 5, lines 2-8 * |