EP0605132 - Illuminated touch button switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.1998 [1998/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/27] | For all designated states OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY 10 Farm Springs Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swaybill, Bruce Peter 22 Bungalow Hill Road Farmington, Connecticut 06032 / US | [1994/27] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/27] | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93310067.9 | 14.12.1993 | [1994/27] | Priority number, date | US19920997059 | 28.12.1992 Original published format: US 997059 | [1994/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0605132 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0605132 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/16 | [1994/27] | CPC: |
H01H13/023 (EP,US);
H01H2219/062 (EP,US);
H01H2219/0622 (EP,US);
H01H2219/064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/27] | Title | German: | Beleuchteter Drucktastenschalter | [1994/27] | English: | Illuminated touch button switch | [1994/27] | French: | Commutateur à touche illuminé | [1994/27] | Examination procedure | 28.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 05.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 22.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/18] | Request for further processing for: | 03.06.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 03.06.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.06.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5039832 (POLACEK RICHARD R [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 68; figure - *; | [A]DE3406295 (KAPFER KARL) [A] 1 * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 10, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0471901 (US ELEVATOR CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 30 - line 58; figure 1 *; | [PA]EP0567357 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [PA] * the whole document * |