EP0605145 - Layered photoreceptor structures with overcoatings containing a triphenylmethane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.1998 [1998/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/27] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pai, Damodar M. 72 Shagbark Way Fairport, New York 14450 / US | 02 /
Defeo, Paul J. 7538 North Fitzhugh Street Sodus Point, New York 14555 / US | 03 /
Carmichael, Kathleen M. 5689 Pease Road Williamson, New York 14589 / US | [1994/27] | Representative(s) | Mackett, Margaret, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | Phillips, Margaret Dawn, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1995/05] | Goode, Ian Roy Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1994/27] | Goode, Ian Roy Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 93310135.4 | 15.12.1993 | [1994/27] | Priority number, date | US19920997412 | 28.12.1992 Original published format: US 997412 | [1994/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0605145 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0605145 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/147 | [1994/27] | CPC: |
G03G5/14708 (EP,US);
G03G5/043 (EP,US);
G03G5/06144 (EP,US);
G03G5/061443 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/27] | Title | German: | Mehrschichtige Photorezeptoren mit Deckschichten, die ein Triphenylmethan enthalten | [1994/27] | English: | Layered photoreceptor structures with overcoatings containing a triphenylmethane | [1994/27] | French: | Photorécepteurs à couches multiples avec couches de revêtement contenant un triphénylméthane | [1994/27] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 21.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 18.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS56133741 ; | [A]JPS5882251 ; | [A]JPS58122553 ; | [DA]US4457994 (PAI DAMODAR M [US], et al) [DA] 1-10 * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 52; examples 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820119), vol. 6, no. 8, Database accession no. (P - 98)<886>, & JP56133741 A 19811020 (TORAY K.K.) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830809), vol. 7, no. 180, Database accession no. (P - 215)<1325>, & JP58082251 A 19830517 (FUJI XEROX K.K.) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831018), vol. 7, no. 234, Database accession no. (P - 230)<1379>, & JP58122553 A 19830721 (KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO K.K.) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |