Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0605993
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
04.10.1996 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 20.11.1996 [1996/47] |
25.06.1996 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
22.03.1996 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 08.05.1996 [1996/19] |
21.03.1996 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 08.05.1996 [1996/19] |
05.01.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.02.1995 |
First examination report |
|
24.01.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] |
11.07.1994 |
Publication of search report |
published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] |
27.05.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.07.1994 [1994/28] |