EP0605993 - Motor vehicle security sensor system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.1996 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.1996 [1996/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORD MOTOR COMPANY County of Wayne Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [1994/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Madau, Adrian Stefan-Lochner Weg 16, Keldenich D-5047 Wesseling / DE | [1994/28] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 93310347.5 | 20.12.1993 | [1994/28] | Priority number, date | US19930001598 | 07.01.1993 Original published format: US 1598 | [1994/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0605993 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0605993 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/10 | [1994/28] | CPC: |
B60R25/1004 (EP,US);
B60R25/1009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/28] | Title | German: | Sicherheitssensorsystem für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1994/28] | English: | Motor vehicle security sensor system | [1994/28] | French: | Système de senseurs de sécurité pour véhicule à moteur | [1994/28] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/19: Teilanmeldung 96102513.7 eingereicht am 20/02/96 | EPB 1996/19: Divisional application 96102513.7 filed on 20/02/96 | EPB 1996/19: Demande divisionnaire 96102513.7 déposée le 20/02/96 | Examination procedure | 13.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 10.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/47] | 27.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/47] | Divisional application(s) | EP96102513.7 / EP0720938 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS61135845 ; | [Y]EP0233390 (AUTOMATED SECURITY HOLDINGS [GB]) [Y] 3-5 * column 1, line 21 - line 33 * * column 2, line 8 - line 52 *; | [XY]US4845464 (DRORI ZE EV [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 23 - line 37 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 17 * * figure - * [Y] 2-5; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861111), vol. 10, no. 331, Database accession no. (M - 533)<2387>, & JP61135845 A 19860623 (FUJITSU TEN LTD.) [Y] 2 * abstract * | [A] - "SENSITIVE VEHICLE SECURITY SYSTEM", AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEER, BURY ST. EDMUNDS, (19911130), no. 5, page 57, XP000244501 [A] 1,2 |