EP0604185 - Inhibitors of HIV protease useful for the treatment of AIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/26] | Inhibitors of HIV protease useful for the treatment of aids | ||
[1998/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jungheim, Louis Nickolaus 8218 Meadowbrook Drive Indianapolis, Indiana 46240 / US | 02 /
Shepherd, Timothy Alan 8463 Slippery Elm Court Indianapolis, Indiana 46227 / US | [1994/26] | Representative(s) | Dehmel, Albrecht, et al Bardehle Papenberg Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | Dehmel, Albrecht, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg- Frohwitter-Geissler & Partner Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/26] | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93310359.0 | 20.12.1993 | [1994/26] | Priority number, date | US19920995256 | 22.12.1992 Original published format: US 995256 | US19930134329 | 12.10.1993 Original published format: US 134329 | [1994/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0604185 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0604185 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D217/26, A61K31/47, C07D401/12, C07D401/06, A61K31/50 | [1994/26] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D215/60 (KR);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
C07D217/26 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/26] | Title | German: | HIV-Proteaseinhibitoren und ihre Verwendung zur Behandlung von AIDS | [1994/26] | English: | Inhibitors of HIV protease useful for the treatment of AIDS | [1998/25] | French: | Inhibiteurs de la HIV protéase pour le traitement du SIDA | [1994/26] |
Former [1994/26] | Inhibitors of HIV protease useful for the treatment of aids | Examination procedure | 03.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/26] | 06.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 27.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/11] | Request for further processing for: | 07.11.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 07.11.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.03.1999 | BE | 24.03.1999 | CH | 24.03.1999 | GR | 24.03.1999 | LI | 24.03.1999 | NL | 24.03.1999 | DK | 24.06.1999 | PT | 24.06.1999 | [2003/45] |
Former [2001/23] | AT | 24.03.1999 | |
BE | 24.03.1999 | ||
CH | 24.03.1999 | ||
GR | 24.03.1999 | ||
LI | 24.03.1999 | ||
NL | 24.03.1999 | ||
PT | 24.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 24.03.1999 | |
BE | 24.03.1999 | ||
CH | 24.03.1999 | ||
LI | 24.03.1999 | ||
NL | 24.03.1999 | ||
PT | 24.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 24.03.1999 | |
BE | 24.03.1999 | ||
NL | 24.03.1999 | ||
PT | 24.06.1999 | ||
CH | 29.06.1999 | ||
LI | 29.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 24.03.1999 | |
BE | 24.03.1999 | ||
NL | 24.03.1999 | ||
PT | 24.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/21] | AT | 24.03.1999 | |
NL | 24.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/36] | NL | 24.03.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0346847 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [Y]WO9208701 (MONSANTO CO [US], et al); | [A]EP0498680 (SANKYO CO [JP]); | [Y]EP0512343 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [YP]EP0526009 (LILLY CO ELI [US]); | [YP]WO9313066 (SYNTEX INC [US]) | Examination | - CHEMICAL & ENGINEERING NEWS, pages 4 - 5 | - METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, pages 279 - 301 | - LEHNINGER, Biochemistry 2nd edition, NEW YORK, WORTH PUBLISHERS INC. | - FITTKAU ET AL, BIOMED. BIOCHIM. ACTA, vol. 43, pages 901 - 907 | - BARRETT ET AL, BIOCHEM. J., vol. 201, pages 189 - 198 | - MA ET AL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 89, pages 6275 - 6279 | - TOUS ET AL, J.MED.CHEM., vol. 33, pages 1620 - 1634 | - MILTON ET AL, SCIENCE, vol. 256, pages 1445 - 1448 | - PETSKO, SCIENCE, vol. 256, pages 1403 - 1404 | by applicant | EP0346847 | WO9208701 | EP0526009 | WO9313066 | - VEDERAS ET AL., J.AM.CHEM. SOC., (1985), vol. 107, pages 7105 - 7109 | - PHOTAKI, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1963), vol. 85, page 1123 | - SASAKI, N.A. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1987), vol. 28, page 6069 | - R. HERRANZ ET AL., J. ORA. CHEM., (1990), vol. 52, pages 2232 - 2234 | - MARGOLIN ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIONHVS. RES. COMMUN., (1990), vol. 167, pages 554 - 560 |