EP0605191 - Polarizing color filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/27] | Color filter having polarizability | ||
[1998/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1994/27] | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itoh, Hisato 2882-2-18, Iijimacho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Misawa, Tsutami 2882-3-13, Iijimacho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Ogiso, Akira 3-42-7-512 Hirado, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Imai, Rihoko 1-9-2-303 Nakamagome, Ota-ku Tokyo / JP | [1994/27] | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1994/27] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 93310433.3 | 22.12.1993 | [1994/27] | Priority number, date | JP19920346334 | 25.12.1992 Original published format: JP 34633492 | [1994/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0605191 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0605191 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, G02F1/1335 | [1994/27] | CPC: |
G02B27/288 (EP,US);
G02B5/3033 (EP,US);
G02F1/133533 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/27] | Title | German: | Polarisierender Farbfilter | [1998/25] | English: | Polarizing color filter | [1998/25] | French: | Filtre couleur polarisant | [1998/25] |
Former [1994/27] | Farbfilter mit Polarisierbarkeit | ||
Former [1994/27] | Color filter having polarizability | ||
Former [1994/27] | Filtre couleur avec polarisabilité | Examination procedure | 11.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/27] | 05.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0232303 ; | [A]EP0182632 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1,3,5,7,9 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0198082 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [DA] 1-3,5,7,9 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS59172610 ; | [A]JPS6254201 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900413), vol. 14, no. 185, Database accession no. (P - 1036), & JP02032303 A 19900202 (NIPPON KAYAKU) [A] 1,3,5,7,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850208), vol. 9, no. 30, Database accession no. (P - 333), & JP59172610 A 19840929 (NITTO DENKI KOGYO) [A] 1,3,5,7,9 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 15, Database accession no. 87-105939, & JPS6254201 A 19870309 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND) [A] 1,3,5,7,9 * abstract * |