EP0605234 - Clutch assembly for an automatic mechanical transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | ||
Former [1994/27] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center Cleveland, Ohio 44114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gooch, Douglas Craig 8086 Yorkville Lane Richland, Michigan / US | 02 /
Waling, Lloyd Alan 8712 N.24th St. Kalamazoo, Michigan / US | 03 /
Steurer, John Scott 1219 Cherry Kalamazoo, Michigan / US | [1994/27] | Representative(s) | Douglas, John Andrew Eaton House Staines Road Hounslow Middlesex TW4 5DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/27] | Douglas, John Andrew Eaton House Staines Road Hounslow Middlesex TW4 5DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 93310549.6 | 24.12.1993 | [1994/27] | Priority number, date | US19920998901 | 30.12.1992 Original published format: US 998901 | [1994/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0605234 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0605234 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16H45/00, F16H61/14, F16D43/284, F16D25/0638 | [1994/27] | CPC: |
F16H57/04 (EP,US);
F16H45/02 (EP,KR,US);
F16D25/0638 (EP,US);
F16D43/284 (EP,US);
F16H45/00 (EP,US);
F16H61/142 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/27] | Title | German: | Kupplungseinheit eines automatischen mechanischen Getriebes | [1994/27] | English: | Clutch assembly for an automatic mechanical transmission | [1994/27] | French: | Embrayage pour une transmission mécanique automatique | [1994/27] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1998/09: (deleted) | EPB 1998/09: (deleted) | EPB 1998/09: (deleted) | EPB 1997/14: Teilanmeldung 96203716.4 eingereicht am 24/12/96 | EPB 1997/14: Divisional application 96203716.4 filed on 24/12/96 | EPB 1997/14: Demande divisionnaire 96203716.4 déposée le 24/12/96 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 03.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96203716.4 / EP0770798 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3176813 (LEE ARTHUR L, et al) [A] 1,6 * figures 1-2 *; | [XY]DE1906170 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,17; | [YA]GB1273859 (BORG WARNER LTD [GB]) [Y] 2,17 * the whole document * [A] 4,5,7-10; | [A]US3667583 (RICHARDS ELMER A) [A] 11,12* abstract *; | [YA]DE2409515 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [Y] 2,17 * figures 1-3 * [A] 4,5,7-10; | [XY]US4004417 (WOODY ALBERT L, et al) [X] 1 * column 4, line 3 - line 47 * [Y] 2,17; | [A]FR2398231 (SAVIEM [FR]) [A] 1,6 * page 8, line 34 - page 9, line 2 *; | [A]WO8703348 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [A] 11,12,14,15 * abstract * |