EP0551226 - Temperature controlling flooring sections, systems, and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.1996 [1996/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helmy, Nashat N. 2035 Ordway Road Golden Valley Minnesota 55439 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | For all designated states Helmy, Nashat N. 2035 Ordway Road Golden Valley, Minnesota 55439 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/28] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 93400015.9 | 06.01.1993 | [1993/28] | Priority number, date | US19920817694 | 07.01.1992 Original published format: US 817694 | [1993/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0551226 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/015, F24D3/16 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
A01K1/0158 (EP);
F24D3/16 (EP);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/28] | Title | German: | Fussbodenelemente, Systeme und Verfahren zur Temperaturregelung | [1993/28] | English: | Temperature controlling flooring sections, systems, and methods | [1993/28] | French: | Sections de plancher, systèmes et procédés pour réglage de température | [1993/28] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 05.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/10] | 01.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/07] | 01.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0368427 (NOOYEN ANTONIUS MARIA ALOYSIUS); | [A]EP0259910 (NOOYEN ANTONIUS MARIA ALOYSIUS); | [A]NL8902322 (ANTONIUS MARIA ALOYSIUS NOOYEN); | [A]FR2624249 (GRIMAUD FRERES SA [FR]); | [A]CH579343 (RUEESCH J & CO); | [A]EP0118139 (NOOYEN ANTONIUS MARIA ALOYSIUS) |