EP0555117 - Vinyl ester resins composed of one or several acrylic monomers and of at least one compatible and copolymerisable macromolecule and their applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.1994 [1994/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APSA Société Anonyme 1-3, rue Pavlov, Z.A des Bruyère F-78190 Trappes / FR | [1993/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lapairy, Jean-Claude 114, rue de Pontoise F-60000 Bauvais / FR | 02 /
Pierre, André 36, Parc des Bordes F-78760 Pontchartrain / FR | [1993/32] | Representative(s) | Kopacz, William James NOVAGRAAF IP 3 Avenue de l'Opéra 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | Kopacz, William James BREESE-MAJEROWICZ, CNIT-WTC1, B.P. 434 F-92053 Paris La Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 93400165.2 | 25.01.1993 | [1993/32] | Priority number, date | FR19920001305 | 05.02.1992 Original published format: FR 9201305 | [1993/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0555117 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/20 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
C08F290/064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/32] | Title | German: | Vinylesterharze bestehend aus einem oder mehreren Acrylmonomeren und aus mindestens einem verträglichen und copolymerisierbaren Makromolekül und ihre Verwendungen | [1993/32] | English: | Vinyl ester resins composed of one or several acrylic monomers and of at least one compatible and copolymerisable macromolecule and their applications | [1993/32] | French: | Résines vinylesters constituées d'un ou plusieurs monomères acryliques et d'au moins une macromolécule compatible et copolymérisable, et leurs utilisations | [1993/32] | File destroyed: | 31.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 12.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/45] | 10.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4264489 (IBSEN ROBERT L, et al); | [X]JPS58204057 ; | [X]JPS55120603 | [X] - DATABASE WPIL Week 8402, Derwent Publications Ltd., LondonGB; AN 84-008710 & JP-A-58 204 057 (MITSUBISHI RAYON) 28 Novembre 1983 | [X] - DATABASE WPI Week 8044, Derwent Publications Ltd., LondonGB; AN 80-77910C & JP-A-55 120 603 (CEMEDINE CO LTD) 18 Septembre 1980 |