EP0557148 - Process for the preparation of a dietary supplement from embryonic tissues [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.1999 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.1999 [1999/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bontemps, Raymond 15, Rue Massenet F-75016 Paris / FR | [1994/33] |
Former [1993/34] | For all designated states Bontemps, Raymond 5, Avenue de la Grande Armée F-75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/34] | Representative(s) | Gutmann, Ernest Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | Gutmann, Ernest Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93400224.7 | 29.01.1993 | [1993/34] | Priority number, date | FR19920001822 | 18.02.1992 Original published format: FR 9201822 | [1993/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0557148 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/54, A23L1/305 | [1993/34] | CPC: |
A23L33/17 (EP,US);
A23L33/175 (EP,US);
A61K35/30 (EP,US);
A61K35/35 (EP,US);
A61K35/407 (EP,US);
A61K35/54 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, LU [1993/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Diätzusatzes auf Basis embryonaler Gewebe | [1993/34] | English: | Process for the preparation of a dietary supplement from embryonic tissues | [1993/34] | French: | Procédé de préparation de compléments alimentaires à base de tissues embryonnaires | [1993/34] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/36] | 17.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/09] | 30.09.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.04.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2578743 (BONTEMPS RAYMOND [FR]); | [X]FR2413912 (BONTEMPS RAYMOND [FR]); | [A]DE2249697 (BUSCHMANN HANS DR MED VET); | [A]EP0249563 (LAUMOND GERARD); | [A]GB1059230 (ARTHUR SAMY) |