EP0561668 - Hydrophobating aqueous composition and its use as an interior or exterior coating formula [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howe, Fabienne 11 rue Artaud F-69000 Lyon / FR | 02 /
Pillon, Jean Le Mas de Fausse F-69970 Marennes / FR | [1993/38] | Representative(s) | Trolliet, Maurice, et al Rhodia Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 40 Rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Trolliet, Maurice, et al RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, Centre de Recherches des Carrières, B.P. 62 F-69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1993/38] | Fabre, Madeleine-France RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE Service Brevets Chimie 25, quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 93400591.9 | 08.03.1993 | [1993/38] | Priority number, date | FR19920003351 | 20.03.1992 Original published format: FR 9203351 | [1993/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0561668 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C09D133/06, C09D183/04 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
C09D133/06 (EP);
C09D183/04 (EP);
C08L83/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09D133/06, C08L2666/14 (EP);
C09D183/04, C08L2666/04, C08L2666/44 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/38] | Title | German: | Wasserfest machende wässrige Zusammensetzung und ihre Verwendung als Mixtur zum Ausrüsten verschiedenartiger Oberflächen im Innen- und Aussenbereich | [1993/38] | English: | Hydrophobating aqueous composition and its use as an interior or exterior coating formula | [1993/38] | French: | Composition aqueuse hydrofugeante et son utilisation comme formulation pour revêtement intérieur ou extérieur de surfaces diverses | [1993/38] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 11.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 08.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1996/20] | 07.08.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0410899 ; | [A]FR2526033 |