EP0561701 - Coloured light-emitting signal lamp for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint-André 93000 Bobigny / FR | [1998/40] |
Former [1993/38] | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint-André F-93000 Bobigny / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gonzalez, Fermin Avda. de la Paz n 8 E-23600 Martos / ES | 02 /
Ordonez, José Avda. de la Fuente 16 E-23600 Martos / ES | [1993/38] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1993/38] | Martin, Jean-Jacques Cabinet REGIMBEAU Martin, Schrimpf, Warcoin, Ahner 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93400684.2 | 17.03.1993 | [1993/38] | Priority number, date | FR19920003223 | 18.03.1992 Original published format: FR 9203223 | [1993/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0561701 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0561701 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F21Q1/00 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
F21S43/255 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1993/38] | Title | German: | Farbiges Licht abgebende Signalleuchte für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1993/38] | English: | Coloured light-emitting signal lamp for motor vehicles | [1993/38] | French: | Feu de signalisation à éclairement coloré pour véhicule automobile | [1993/38] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/11] | 18.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3400269 ; | [Y]EP0371553 ; | [A]DE2942260 ; | [A]GB2094463 ; | [A]FR2526522 |