EP0561706 - Emitter/receiver with coherent detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM Etablissement autonome de droit public 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM Etablissement autonome de droit public, 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1993/38] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM Etablissement autonome de droit public, 6, Place d'Alleray F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakajima, Hisao 10, Avenue J.B. Fortin F-92220 Bagneux / FR | [1993/38] | Representative(s) | Signore, Robert, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | Signore, Robert, et al c/o SOCIETE DE PROTECTION DES INVENTIONS 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93400693.3 | 18.03.1993 | [1993/38] | Priority number, date | FR19920003382 | 20.03.1992 Original published format: FR 9203382 | [1993/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0561706 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0561706 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/14, H01S3/00, H04B10/24 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
H04B10/43 (EP,US);
H01S5/0014 (EP,US);
H01S5/12 (EP,US);
H01S5/0028 (EP,US);
H01S5/0625 (EP,US);
H01S5/06258 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1993/38] | Title | German: | Sender/Empfänger mit kohärenter Detektion | [1993/38] | English: | Emitter/receiver with coherent detection | [1993/38] | French: | Emetteur-récepteur à détection cohérente | [1993/38] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 25.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP3203268 ; | [A]JP1187889 ; | [A]EP0420742 (FRANCE ETAT [FR]); | [A]FR2662883 (FRANCE ETAT [FR]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 470 (E-1139)1991 & JP-A-32 03 268 ( TOSHIBA ), & JP3203268 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 476 (E-837)1989 & JP-A-11 87 889 ( HITACHI ), & JP1187889 A 00000000 |