EP0562941 - Distance measuring device and its application to an obstacle detection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1993/39] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grossmann, Benoist Thomson-CSF, SCPI, BP 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | 02 /
Defour, Martin Thomson-CSF, SCPI, BP 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | 03 /
Fertala, Rémi Thomson-CSF, SCPI, BP 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | [1993/39] | Representative(s) | Lincot, Georges, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle, Département Brevets, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | Lincot, Georges, et al THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 93400734.5 | 22.03.1993 | [1993/39] | Priority number, date | FR19920003716 | 27.03.1992 Original published format: FR 9203716 | [1993/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0562941 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0562941 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/88, G01S7/48, G02B26/08 | [1993/39] | CPC: |
G01S7/4817 (EP,US);
G01S17/89 (EP,US);
G01S17/933 (EP,US);
G01S7/4812 (EP,US);
G01S7/499 (EP,US);
G02B26/0891 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/39] | Title | German: | Entfernungsmessgerät und dessen Anwendung in einem System zur Hinderniserkennung | [1993/39] | English: | Distance measuring device and its application to an obstacle detection system | [1993/39] | French: | Dispositif de télémétrie et son application à un système de détection d'obstacles | [1993/39] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 02.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.08.1997 | SE | 13.11.1997 | [2008/05] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 13.08.1997 | |
SE | 13.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | SE | 13.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2258637 (ELTRO GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US4068124 (KLEIDER ALFRED); | [Y]US4572662 (SILVERMAN BERNARD B [US]); | [A]US4698498 (MAHONEY THOMAS J [US], et al) |