EP0565436 - Wiperarm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes d'Essuyage Service Propriété Industrielle 8 Rue Louis Lormand CS 90581 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES D'ESSUYAGE Z.A. de l'Agiot, 8 rue Louis Lormand F-78321 La Verrière / FR | ||
Former [1993/41] | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES D'ESSUYAGE 11, rue Faraday F-78180 Montigny-Le-Bretonneux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schon, Wilfrid Chabreyras F-63580 Saint Etienne/Usson / FR | [1993/41] | Representative(s) | Schrimpf, Robert Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | Schrimpf, Robert Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93400894.7 | 06.04.1993 | [1993/41] | Priority number, date | FR19920004296 | 08.04.1992 Original published format: FR 9204296 | [1993/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565436 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0565436 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/34, B60S1/58 | [1993/41] | CPC: |
B60S1/34 (EP);
B60S1/3468 (EP);
B60S1/3479 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1993/41] | Title | German: | Wischerarm | [1993/41] | English: | Wiperarm | [1993/41] | French: | Bras d'essuie-glace | [1993/41] | Examination procedure | 21.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/16] | 22.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 12.06.1996 | GB | 12.06.1996 | [2002/26] |
Former [1997/17] | GB | 12.06.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2071310 ; | [Y]GB2231780 ; | [YP]EP0479659 ; | [Y]GB2188537 ; | [A]FR2103349 ; | [Y]DE9107295U |