EP0565442 - Combustion chamber wall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION "SNECMA" 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barbier, Gérard Yves Georges 1, rue Louis Blériot F-91420 Morangis / FR | 02 /
Bardey, Xavier Marie Henri 34 Le Hameau F-77590 Chartrettes / FR | 03 /
Desaulty, Michel André Albert 2, rue de la Pierre Décollée F-77240 Vert Saint Denis / FR | 04 /
Lancelot, Eric 28, avenue Alexandre Ribot F-77000 Melun / FR | [1993/41] | Application number, filing date | 93400907.7 | 07.04.1993 | [1993/41] | Priority number, date | FR19920004282 | 08.04.1992 Original published format: FR 9204282 | [1993/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565442 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0565442 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/00, F01D5/18 | [1993/41] | CPC: |
F01D5/181 (EP);
F23R3/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/41] | Title | German: | Brennkammerwand | [1993/41] | English: | Combustion chamber wall | [1993/41] | French: | Paroi de chambre de combustion | [1993/41] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 17.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61019687 ; | [A]SU1586854 ; | [A]JP56101015 ; | [YD]FR2221621 ; | [Y]CH269598 ; | [A]GB2049152 ; | [A]US3137995 ; | [A]DE510847 | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Section Ch, Week 8610, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A03, AN 86066569 & JP-A-61 019 687 (MITSUI PETROCHEM IND.) 28 Janvier 1986, & JP61019687 A 00000000 | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Section Ch, Week 9128, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M22, AN 91205794 & SU-A-1 586 854 (DNEPR METAL INST.) 23 Août 1990, & SU1586854 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 174 (M-96)10 Novembre 1981 & JP-A-56 101 015 ( FUJI HEAVY IND.LTD. ) 13 Août 1981, & JP56101015 A 00000000 |