EP0566473 - Fastening of a heat-exchanger with a tubular header box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1995 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1995 [1995/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR 8, rue Louis-Lormand, La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR 8, rue Louis-Lormand La Verrière F-78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tordjeman, Jean-Michel 5, allée de l'Aude F-78990 Elancourt / FR | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Gamonal, Didier, et al Valeo Management Services Propriété Industrielle 2 Rue Andrée Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | Gamonal, Didier, et al Valeo Management Services Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 F-94004 Créteil / FR | ||
Former [1993/42] | Gamonal, Didier VALEO MANAGEMENT SERVICES Propriété Industrielle, " Le Triangle" 15 rue des Rosiers F-93585 Saint-Ouen Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 93400954.9 | 13.04.1993 | [1993/42] | Priority number, date | FR19920004709 | 16.04.1992 Original published format: FR 9204709 | [1993/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0566473 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0566473 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/00 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
F28F9/002 (EP,KR,US);
B60K11/04 (EP,US);
F28D1/0435 (EP,US);
F28F9/0243 (EP,KR,US);
F28D2021/0084 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0094 (EP,US);
F28F21/06 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1993/42] | Title | German: | Befestigung eines Wärmetauschers mit rohrförmiger Endkammer | [1993/42] | English: | Fastening of a heat-exchanger with a tubular header box | [1993/42] | French: | Dispositif pour la fixation d'un échangeur de chaleur à boîte collectrice tubulaire | [1995/01] |
Former [1993/42] | Dispositif pour la fixation d'un échangeur de chaleur à boite collectrice tubulaire | Examination procedure | 03.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/18] | 22.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0132844 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]GB2223091 (CALSONIC CORP [JP]) |