Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0567377 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2000 | B1 | EP0567377 | 27.10.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9204831 | 21.04.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69328886T | 04.01.2001 | T2 | DE69328886D1 | 27.07.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9204831 | 21.04.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0567377T | 06.11.2000 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9204831 | 21.04.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2690262 | 20.12.1996 | B1 | FR2690262 | 22.10.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9204831 | 21.04.1992 |