EP0569297 - Holding device for several conduits, cables or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.1997 [1997/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAPID S.A. 251 Boulevard Péreire F-75017 Paris / FR | [1993/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leon, Jean-Pierre 41, Avenue du Maréchal Joffre F-78000 Houilles / FR | [1993/45] | Representative(s) | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al CABINET WEINSTEIN 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al CABINET WEINSTEIN 20, Avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93401161.0 | 05.05.1993 | [1993/45] | Priority number, date | FR19920005660 | 07.05.1992 Original published format: FR 9205660 | [1993/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0569297 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0569297 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/22 | [1993/45] | CPC: |
F16L3/2235 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1993/45] | Title | German: | Halterung für mehrere Leitungen, Kabel oder ähnliches | [1993/45] | English: | Holding device for several conduits, cables or the like | [1993/45] | French: | Attache pour le maintien de plusieurs canalisations, câbles ou analogues | [1993/45] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/13] | 16.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2306969 ; | [A]DE8213664U |