EP0572296 - System for the chemical sealing of or fastening element in a hollow material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.1998 [1998/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DE PROSPECTION ET D'INVENTIONS TECHNIQUES SPIT Route de Lyon 26501 Bourg-Les-Valence Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | For all designated states SOCIETE DE PROSPECTION ET D'INVENTIONS TECHNIQUES SPIT Route de Lyon F-26501 Bourg-Les-Valence Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barthomeuf, Jean Paul Alixan 26300 Bourg de Peage / FR | 02 /
Gauthier, Alain Les Prés No 12 07300 Saint Jean de Muzols / FR | [1993/48] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Gérard, et al Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | Bloch, Gérard, et al 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93401198.2 | 11.05.1993 | [1993/48] | Priority number, date | FR19920006499 | 27.05.1992 Original published format: FR 9206499 | [1993/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572296 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572296 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16B13/14 | [1993/48] | CPC: |
F16B13/141 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/48] | Title | German: | System zum chemischen Einmauern von einem Befestigungselement in einem hohlen Material | [1993/48] | English: | System for the chemical sealing of or fastening element in a hollow material | [1993/48] | French: | Système de scellement chimique d'un élément de fixation dans un matériau creux | [1993/48] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 11.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 06.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3325800 ; | [Y]FR2291394 ; | [Y]EP0287505 ; | [Y]GB1340117 ; | [Y]DE2723729 ; | [AD]FR2200917 |