EP0572322 - Installation and process for the precalcination of any mineral matters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.09.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHNIP 170 Place Henri Régnault 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1997/48] |
Former [1993/48] | For all designated states CLE 170 Place Henri Regnault F-92400 COURBEVOIE / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paliard, Maurice 23 Rue Gambetta F-42000 Saint-Etienne / FR | [1993/48] | Representative(s) | Bentz, Jean-Paul, et al Cabinet Weinstein 56A Rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Bentz, Jean-Paul, et al Cabinet Weinstein, 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1993/48] | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al Cabinet Z. Weinstein 20, Avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93401355.8 | 27.05.1993 | [1993/48] | Priority number, date | FR19920006579 | 29.05.1992 Original published format: FR 9206579 | [1993/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572322 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572322 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0572322 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F27B7/20 | [1993/48] | CPC: |
C04B7/43 (EP,US);
F27B7/2033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/48] | Title | German: | Anlage und Verfahren zur Prekalzination von alle mineralen Gut | [1993/48] | English: | Installation and process for the precalcination of any mineral matters | [1993/48] | French: | Installation et procédé de précalcination de matières minérales quelconques | [1993/48] | Examination procedure | 23.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 25.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.10.1996
14.11.1996
ADMISSIBLE F.L. Smidth & Co. A/S -Patent & Trademark Department- Vigerslev Allé 77 DK-2500 Kopenhagen-Valby / DK Opponent's representative Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | 02
08.10.1996
23.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE FCB 38 RUE DE LA République 93100 Montreuil / FR Opponent's representative Duthoit, Michel Georges André Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 96/98, Boulevard Carnot B.P. 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | 03
24.10.1996
06.11.1996
ADMISSIBLE Krupp Polysius AG Graf-Galen-Strasse 17 D-59269 Beckum / DE Opponent's representative Tetzner, Michael Tetzner & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.10.1996
14.11.1996
ADMISSIBLE F.L. Smidth & Co. A/S Vigerslev Allé 77 DK-2500 Kopenhagen-Valby / DK Opponent's representative Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
02
08.10.1996
23.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE FCB 38 RUE DE LA République 93100 Montreuil / FR Opponent's representative Duthoit, Michel Georges André Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 96/98, Boulevard Carnot B.P. 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | |||
03
24.10.1996
06.11.1996
ADMISSIBLE Krupp Polysius AG Graf-Galen-Strasse 17 D-59269 Beckum / DE Opponent's representative Tetzner, Michael Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | |||
Former [1997/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.10.1996
14.11.1996
ADMISSIBLE F.L. Smidth & Co. A/S Vigerslev Allé 77 DK-2500 Kopenhagen-Valby / DK Opponent's representative Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
02
08.10.1996
23.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE FCB 38 RUE DE LA République 93100 Montreuil / FR Opponent's representative Duthoit, Michel Georges André Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 96/98, Boulevard Carnot B.P. 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | |||
03
24.10.1996
06.11.1996
ADMISSIBLE Krupp Polysius AG Graf-Galen-Strasse 17 D-59269 Beckum / DE Opponent's representative Tetzner, Michael Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | |||
Former [1996/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.10.1996
14.11.1996
ADMISSIBLE F.L. Smidth & Co. A/S Vigerslev Allé 77 DK-2500 Kopenhagen-Valby / DK Opponent's representative Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
02
08.10.1996
23.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE FCB 38 RUE DE LA République 93100 Montreuil / FR Opponent's representative Fontanié, Etienne COMPAGNIE DE FIVES-LILLE, 38 rue de la République 93100 Montreuil / FR | |||
03
24.10.1996
06.11.1996
ADMISSIBLE Krupp Polysius AG Graf-Galen-Strasse 17 D-59269 Beckum / DE Opponent's representative Tetzner, Michael Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | |||
Former [1996/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.10.1996
14.11.1996
ADMISSIBLE F.L. Smidth & Co. A/S Vigerslev Allé 77 DK-2500 Kopenhagen-Valby / DK Opponent's representative Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
02
08.10.1996
23.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE FCB 38 RUE DE LA République 93100 Montreuil / FR Opponent's representative Fontanié, Etienne COMPAGNIE DE FIVES-LILLE, 38 rue de la République 93100 Montreuil / FR | 13.12.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.06.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.11.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 06.03.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.03.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.08.2001 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 08.04.1999 | Appeal received No. T0361/99 | 01.06.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.03.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 06.03.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.03.2001 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2541564 (KLOECKNER WERKE AG); | [Y]US4050882 (KOHL ROBERT F, et al); | [A]DE3817357 (KRUPP POLYSIUS AG [DE]) | [Y] - Z.K.G vol. 38, no. 2, 1 Février 1985, pages 57 - 66 A.SCHEUER UND O.GARDEIK 'bildung und afbau von no in zementofenanlagen.' |