EP0627707 - Method of manufacturing a memory card and memory card obtained thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2000 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER Systèmes 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | [1999/11] |
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states SOLAIC (société anonyme) 3, Place de la Pyramide F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Audoux, Jean-Noel 3, rue des Fauvettes, Lotissement Rondeau F-45570 Ouzouer sur Loire / FR | 02 /
Gaumet, Michel 121, rue du Chalet F-45560 Saint-Denis-en-Val / FR | 03 /
Gouiller, Michel 255, rue des Glycines F-45160 Olivet / FR | 04 /
Thevenot, Benoît 68, allée Maurice Ravel F-45160 Olivet / FR | [1994/49] | Representative(s) | Bugnon-Hays, Claudine PATCO S.A. 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | Bugnon-Hays, Claudine PATCO S.A. 23, rue La Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1994/49] | Lemoine, Robert Cabinet Malémont 42, Avenue du Président Wilson F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93401397.0 | 02.06.1993 | [1994/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0627707 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0627707 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [1994/49] | CPC: |
G06K19/07743 (EP);
G06K19/07745 (EP);
H01L24/19 (EP);
H01L24/25 (EP);
H01L24/82 (EP);
H01L2224/04105 (EP);
H01L2224/24225 (EP);
H01L2224/24227 (EP);
H01L2224/2518 (EP);
H01L2224/32225 (EP);
H01L2224/73267 (EP);
H01L2924/14 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/24227, H01L2924/15165 (EP);
H01L2924/14, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/15165, H01L2924/15153 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Speicherkarte und nach diesem Verfahren hergestellte Speicherkarte | [1994/49] | English: | Method of manufacturing a memory card and memory card obtained thereby | [1994/49] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une carte à mémoire et carte à mémoire ainsi obtenue | [1994/49] | Examination procedure | 04.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 18.11.1996 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.1999 | ES | 15.12.1999 | GR | 15.12.1999 | IT | 15.12.1999 | NL | 15.12.1999 | SE | 15.12.1999 | DK | 15.03.2000 | PT | 15.03.2000 | LU | 02.06.2000 | BE | 30.06.2000 | CH | 30.06.2000 | LI | 30.06.2000 | MC | 30.06.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2005/23] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
ES | 15.12.1999 | ||
GR | 15.12.1999 | ||
NL | 15.12.1999 | ||
SE | 15.12.1999 | ||
DK | 15.03.2000 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
LU | 02.06.2000 | ||
BE | 30.06.2000 | ||
CH | 30.06.2000 | ||
LI | 30.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
ES | 15.12.1999 | ||
GR | 15.12.1999 | ||
NL | 15.12.1999 | ||
SE | 15.12.1999 | ||
DK | 15.03.2000 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
BE | 30.06.2000 | ||
CH | 30.06.2000 | ||
LI | 30.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
ES | 15.12.1999 | ||
NL | 15.12.1999 | ||
SE | 15.12.1999 | ||
DK | 15.03.2000 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
BE | 30.06.2000 | ||
CH | 30.06.2000 | ||
LI | 30.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
ES | 15.12.1999 | ||
NL | 15.12.1999 | ||
SE | 15.12.1999 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
BE | 30.06.2000 | ||
CH | 30.06.2000 | ||
LI | 30.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
ES | 15.12.1999 | ||
SE | 15.12.1999 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
BE | 30.06.2000 | ||
CH | 30.06.2000 | ||
LI | 30.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
ES | 15.12.1999 | ||
SE | 15.12.1999 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
BE | 30.06.2000 | ||
CH | 30.06.2000 | ||
LI | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
SE | 15.12.1999 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
BE | 30.06.2000 | ||
CH | 30.06.2000 | ||
LI | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
BE | 30.06.2000 | ||
CH | 30.06.2000 | ||
LI | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/22] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
IE | 15.12.1999 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
BE | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
IE | 15.12.1999 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | PT | 15.03.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62107391 ; | [A]GB2096541 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG); | [A]EP0344058 (SCHLUMBERGER IND SA [FR]); | [A]EP0426406 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 319 (P-627)(2766) 17 Octobre 1987 & JP-A-62 107 391 ( NIPPON TEXAS INSTR. K.K. ) 18 Mai 1987, & JP62107391 A 00000000 |