EP0574302 - Apparatus for design of information control nets for process modelling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BULL S.A. 68, route de Versailles 78430 Louveciennes / FR | [1999/11] |
Former [1993/50] | For all designated states BULL S.A. Tour BULL, 1, place Carpeaux F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marcus, Michel 68, rue Julian Grimau F-94400 Vitry / FR | [1993/50] | Representative(s) | Colombe, Michel, et al Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle BULL SA Poste courrier:LV 58F35 68 route de Versailles 78430 Louveciennes / FR | [1999/35] |
Former [1993/50] | Debay, Yves, et al BULL S.A. Tour BULL Cédex 74 PC/TB2803 F-92039 Paris La Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 93401458.0 | 08.06.1993 | [1993/50] | Priority number, date | FR19920006932 | 09.06.1992 Original published format: FR 9206932 | [1993/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0574302 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0574302 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [1993/50] | CPC: |
G06F8/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/50] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Entwurf von Informationskontrollnetzen für Prozessmodellierung | [1993/50] | English: | Apparatus for design of information control nets for process modelling | [1993/50] | French: | Dispositif de conception de réseaux de commande d'informations pour la modélisation de processus | [1998/45] |
Former [1993/50] | Dispositif de conception de réseaux de commande d'informations pour la modélisation de tous processus | Examination procedure | 08.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 15.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 01.09.1999 | [2002/26] | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SOFTWARE PRACTICE & EXPERIENCE. vol. 21, no. 8, Août 1991, CHICHESTER, GB pages 823 - 844 M. BALDASSARI ET AL. 'PROTOB: AN OBJECT-ORIENTED CASE TOOL FOR MODELLING AND PROTOTYPING DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS' | [X] - JOURNAL OF PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING. vol. 9, no. 2, Juin 1990, DULUTH, MN, US pages 128 - 137 V.Y. SHEN ET AL. 'VERDI: A VISUAL ENVIRONMENT FOR DESIGNING DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS' |