EP0585147 - Low density polyolefin foam, foamable polyolefin compositions and process for making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASTRO-VALCOUR, INCORPORATED 18 Peck Avenue, P.O. Box 71 Glens Falls New York 12801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | For all designated states ASTRO-VALCOUR, INCORPORATED 18 Peck Avenue, P.O. Box 71 Glens Falls New York 12801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kisner, Ronnie D. Rt. 5 Box 329 Queensbury, New York 12804 / US | [1994/09] | Representative(s) | Wagret, Frédéric Cabinet Wagret 19, rue de Milan 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Wagret, Frédéric Cabinet Wagret 23, rue de Saint-Pétersbourg F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93401725.2 | 02.07.1993 | [1994/09] | Priority number, date | US19920935721 | 27.08.1992 Original published format: US 935721 | [1994/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0585147 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0585147 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/00, C08J9/14, // C08L23/02 | [1994/09] | CPC: |
C08J9/0061 (EP);
C08J9/141 (EP);
C08K5/103 (EP);
C08L23/06 (EP);
C08J2323/02 (EP);
C08J2409/00 (EP);
C08L53/02 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/103, C08L23/04 (EP);
C08L23/06, C08L2666/24 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/09] | Title | German: | Polyolefinschaum mit geringer Dichte, aufschäumende Polyolefinzusammensetzungen und Herstellungsverfahren | [1994/09] | English: | Low density polyolefin foam, foamable polyolefin compositions and process for making same | [1994/09] | French: | Mousse de polyoléfine à base densité, compositions de polyoléfines expansibles et procédé pour les fabriquer | [1994/09] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/24] | 17.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1999/02] | GB | 08.04.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2132295 ; | [A]US4692471 ; | [A]WO8808864 ; | [A]US3793283 ; | [A]EP0229882 |