EP0584005 - Integrated optical sensor, especially for chemical substances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | [1997/51] |
Former [1994/08] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Valette, Serge 41, rue des Eaux Claires F-38100 Grenoble / FR | [1994/08] | Representative(s) | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93402021.5 | 06.08.1993 | [1994/08] | Priority number, date | FR19920009869 | 10.08.1992 Original published format: FR 9209869 | [1994/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0584005 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0584005 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/77, G01N21/45 | [1994/08] | CPC: |
G02B6/132 (EP,US);
G01N21/552 (EP,US);
G01N2021/432 (EP,US);
G01N2021/8578 (EP,US);
G01N21/85 (EP,US);
G02B2006/12038 (EP,US);
G02B2006/2865 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/08] | Title | German: | Integrierter optischer Sensor, insbesondere für chemische Substanzen | [1994/08] | English: | Integrated optical sensor, especially for chemical substances | [1994/08] | French: | Capteur en optique intégrée, notamment pour substances chimiques | [1994/08] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/39] | 21.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.12.1997 | [2003/08] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0061884 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]GB2228082 (MARCONI GEC LTD [GB]) [A] 1,5,7* page 5, paragraph 3; figure 4 *; | [A]WO9205429 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * page 12, line 28 - page 13, line 32 * * figure 8 * | [DA] - SHANI ET AL., "EFFICIENT COUPLING OF A SEMICONDUCTOR LASER TO AN OPTICAL FIBER BY MEANS OF A TAPERED WAVEGUIDE ON SILICON", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, NEW YORK US, (19891204), vol. 55, no. 23, pages 2389 - 2391 [DA] 9 * page 2389, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * |