EP0591033 - Toolholder for boring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL Tour Fiat, 1 Place de la Coupole, Cédex 16 92084 Paris La Défense / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL Tour Fiat, 1 Place de la Coupole, Cédex 16 F-92084 Paris La Défense / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mortier, Guy 7 bis, Cour de Launay F-72100 Bonnetable / FR | 02 /
Chartrain, Jean-Claude Les Biches F-72390 Lavare / FR | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 93402338.3 | 24.09.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | FR19920011608 | 29.09.1992 Original published format: FR 9211608 | [1994/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0591033 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0591033 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B23B29/18, B23Q5/34 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
B23Q5/341 (EP);
B23B29/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, IT, LI [1994/14] | Title | German: | Werkzeughalter für innere Bearbeitung | [1994/14] | English: | Toolholder for boring | [1994/14] | French: | Porte-outil d'usinage interne à dépincement | [1994/14] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/28] | 26.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.03.1996 | ES | 13.03.1996 | DE | 14.06.1996 | [2002/26] |
Former [1997/03] | AT | 13.03.1996 | |
DE | 14.06.1996 | ||
Former [1996/44] | DE | 14.06.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH99334 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [A] 1 * page 2, column L; figure 1 *; | [A]GB481831 (WILHELM KROLL) [A] 1 * page 2, line 7 - line 39; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2269908 (GROENE WILLIAM F, et al) [A] * figures 4-6 * |