EP0592273 - Vehicle seat with a partially movable backrest [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOBBYCAR S.A. F-41400 Thenay / FR | [1994/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wardavoir, François "Les Aulnières", Route d'Aulnières F-41120 Cellettes / FR | [1994/15] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1996/13] |
Former [1994/15] | Keib, Gérard, et al Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A., 52 rue de Monceau F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93402343.3 | 24.09.1993 | [1994/15] | Priority number, date | FR19920011774 | 05.10.1992 Original published format: FR 9211774 | [1994/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0592273 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0592273 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/20, B60N2/32, B60R22/26 | [1994/15] | CPC: |
B60N2/206 (EP);
B60N2/01583 (EP);
B60N2/3013 (EP);
B60R22/26 (EP);
B60R2022/1818 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/15] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugsitz mit einer teilbeweglichen Rückenlehne | [1994/15] | English: | Vehicle seat with a partially movable backrest | [1994/15] | French: | Siège pour véhicule comprenant un dossier partiellement mobile | [1994/15] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1993 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 31.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/28] | 14.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2924144 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [Y] 1,8 * page 7, line 1 - line 16 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0402195 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 4 - line 29 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4218074 (CRAWFORD RAY V [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 17 - line 50 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4610480 (YAMADA HISAO [JP], et al) [A] 1; | [A]EP0432824 (SAAB AUTOMOBILE [SE]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 13 - line 32 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]FR2595300 (PEUGEOT [FR]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,3; claim 1 *; | [A]JPS5914548 ; | [A]FR2361918 (KLIPPAN GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0439565 (TEVES GMBH CO OHG ALFRED [DE]); | [YA]GB2201087 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [Y] 8 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 29 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 1; | [A]EP0241969 (MEVERGNIES MARCEL NEVE DE) [A] 8 * column 4, line 18 - line 45 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2629399 (LAMBIN BENOIT [FR]) [A] 8 * page 1 - page 5; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4005902 (BALIN CHAIM) [A] 10 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 4; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0151426 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [A] 10 * page 1 - page 8; figures 1,2 *; | [AP]FR2677601 (MATRA AUTOMOBILE [FR]) [AP] 10 * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 22; figures 1-3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840511), vol. 8, no. 100, Database accession no. (M - 295)<1537> , & JP59014548 A 00000000 (TOYO KOGYO) [A] 1 * abstract * |